Kanaan, Hassan Diab (CPSO#: 97304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Feb 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beaumont Hospital
Department of pathology
3601 west thirteen mile rd
Royal Oak MI  48073
United States
Phone: 248-898-9069
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hassan Kanaan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 19 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 17 Feb 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Hassan Diab Kanaan may practise medicine independently in anatomical
                  pathology, only.