Kandel, Sonja Marion (CPSO#: 94911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2013

Expiry Date:  04 Sep 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Hamburg University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4081
Fax: (416) 323-7325
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sonja Marion Kandel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kandel ( CPSO# 94911 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2

Business Address:
2242-76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 05 Sep 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 17 May 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 18 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 04 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Sep 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sonja Marion Kandel may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Kandel holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Kandel  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Kandel's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Kandel's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is issued on September 5, 2013.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 4, 2020.