Kang, Matthew (CPSO#: 93793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Clinic
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: 905-336-4103
Fax: 905-336-6492
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Kang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kang ( CPSO# 93793 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 336-4103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW KANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014