Kanji, Zainul Abdulmalik Alibhai (CPSO#: 87870)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Kachchi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zainul A.A. Kanji Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 14 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: 2nd Floor, 595 Bradley Avenue London, ON N6E 3Z8 Telephone: 519-668-0491
Date Received: 21 Mar 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 May 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jun 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2016