Kankesan, Janarthanan (CPSO#: 90968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oncology Clinic
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2442
Fax: (613) 961-2503
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Kankesan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kankesan ( CPSO# 90968 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre for Southeastern Ontario
Kingston General Hospital
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2630

Business Address:
QHC - Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANARTHANAN KANKESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANKESAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2013