Kannegiesser, Kristen Marie (CPSO#: 95476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
345 Lakeshore Road East
Suite 502
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: 9058454511
Fax: 9058458133
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristen Kannegiesser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kannegiesser ( CPSO# 95476 )

Business Address:
Lakeshore Medical Group
502 - 345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 845-4511

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTEN MARIE KANNEGIESSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANNEGIESSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2014