Kapila, Varun (CPSO#: 84385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Cotrelle Blvd., Unit # 105
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone: (905) 497-2255
Fax: (905) 497-2261
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3400 Ext. 34567
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3400 Ext. 34567
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Sukhai & V. Kapila Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kapila ( CPSO# 84385 )
Dr. N. Sukhai ( CPSO# 84608 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
Suite 105
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-2255

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 11 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VARUN KAPILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPILA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011