Kaprielian, Anoush Ashen (CPSO#: 81521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Cornelia West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: (613) 283-2330
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaprielian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kaprielian ( CPSO# 81521 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Business Address:
Perth and Smith Falls Hospital
60 Cornelia West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANOUSH ASHEN KAPRIELIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPRIELIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 07 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2008