Kapur, Shiv (CPSO#: 94998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Delhi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Dept of Pathology and Lab Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43208
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GEORGIAN BAY GENERAL HOSPITAL
1112 ST ANDREWS DRIVE
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Collingwood general and marine
hospital
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shiv Kapur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kapur ( CPSO# 94998 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Dept of Pathology and Lab Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 28 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Shiv  Kapur  may  practice medicine independently in anatomical pathology,
            only.