Karameh, Wael (CPSO#: 111739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2017

Expiry Date:  31 Mar 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Lebanese University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre of Addiction & mental Health
Geriatric Psychiatry
Queen site
80 workman way, 6th floor, Room 631
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 39394
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels' Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5320
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAEL KARAMEH shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KARAMEH is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. KARAMEH shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KARAMEH is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KARAMEH shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. KARAMEH is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KARAMEH no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Mar 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2017 to 23 Jun 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2017 to 31 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Mar 2019
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2019