Karatela, Kamran Ahmed (CPSO#: 94953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Apr 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Department of Internal Medicine
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B5
Phone: (519) 352-6400
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

72 victoria avenue
Chatham ON  N7L3A1
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karatela, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Karatela ( CPSO# 94953 )

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
Department of Internal Medicine
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B5
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
72 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Sep 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Kamran Ahmed Karatela may practise medicine independently in internal
                  medicine, only.