Karim, Sadiqa (CPSO#: 94550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Oct 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Sind Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone: (905) 354-1111
Fax: (905) 354-7902
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sadiqa Karim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karim ( CPSO# 94550 )

Business Address:
4383 Portage Road
Suite 202
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A6
Phone Number: (905) 354-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Oct 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Sadiqa Karim may practice medicine independently in family medicine, only.