Kassardjian, Charles Dikran (CPSO#: 88817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Dept of Clinical Neurophysiology
9-Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5298
Fax: 416-864-6095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kassardjian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kassardjian ( CPSO# 88817 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Clinical Neurophysiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5298

Business Address:
55 Queen Street East
Suite 925
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5298

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES DIKRAN KASSARDJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSARDJIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2015