Kavanagh, Douglas Gordon (CPSO#: 95643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3080 Yonge Street
Suite 5080
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: 416-782-4447
Fax: 416-782-1284
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Kavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2018


Corporation Name: Douglas Kavanagh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kavanagh ( CPSO# 95643 )

Business Address:
3080 Yonge Street
Suite 5080
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (416) 782-4447

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS GORDON KAVANAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAVANAGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013