Kay, Gary Peter (CPSO#: 76050)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1053 Carling Avenue - D6
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 18229
Fax: (613) 761-4177
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1980 Ogilvie Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 9L3
Canada
Phone: 613-701-1222
Fax: 613-701-1223
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Saint-Vincent Site
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Canada
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: 613-782-2724
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. P. Kay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kay ( CPSO# 76050 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Psychiatry
D6-1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1980 Ogilvie Road
Unit 216
Ottawa ON  K1J 9L3
Phone Number: (613) 701-1222

Business Address:
Elisabeth Bruyere Hospital
Saint-Vincent Hospital Site
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY PETER KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006