Kazemi, Mojdeh (CPSO#: 96145)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Farsi, Persian, Pushto

Education:Isfahan University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Health Clinic
300 Rossland Road East
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 239-7663
Fax: (905) 239-4664
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mojdeh Kazemi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kazemi ( CPSO# 96145 )

Business Address:
One Health Clinic
300 Rossland Road East
Unit 200
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone Number: (905) 239-7663

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOJDEH KAZEMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZEMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013