Kee, Gordon Ashley (CPSO#: 77598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton ER
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gordon Kee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kee ( CPSO# 77598 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton ER
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON ASHLEY KEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2005