Kelly, Shawn Hamilton (CPSO#: 88694)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strandherd Crossing Medical Centre
3161 Strandherd Dr.
unit 305
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone: 6138235245
Fax: 613-823-0063
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chatha-Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chatha ( CPSO# 86945 )
Dr. S. Kelly ( CPSO# 88694 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4

Business Address:
3161 Strandherd Drive
Suite 305
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 823-5245

Business Address:
Unit 120
1130 Morrison Drive
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N6
Phone Number: (613) 820-5050

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAWN HAMILTON KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Queen's University, 19 Nov 2013 to 02 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014