Kenyon, Cynthia Florence (CPSO#: 28356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital
Room D4 206
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 64361
Fax: (519) 646-6123
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. F. Kenyon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kenyon ( CPSO# 28356 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital
Room D4 206
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA FLORENCE KENYON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENYON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983