Khadim, Hamid Ahmadzai (CPSO#: 91674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: Ahmadzai, Hamid (used until: 06 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Pushto

Education:Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough, Ontario
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G2B9
Canada
Phone: 905 5768711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hamid A Khadim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khadim ( CPSO# 91674 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAMID AHMADZAI KHADIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHADIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2009 to 02 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2012