Khalatbari, Azadeh (CPSO#: 93796)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4949 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y1
Phone: (416) 454-9767
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azadeh Khalatbari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khalatbari ( CPSO# 93796 )

Business Address:
4949 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y1
Phone Number: (647) 293-3266

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZADEH KHALATBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALATBARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015