Khalefih, Tarek Ahmad (CPSO#: 85228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 112
330 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 636-9387
Fax: (905) 636-9388
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

221 miller Dr
ON L7G 6G4
Georgetown ON  L9T 8T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-6776
Fax: (905) 6936634
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

201-450 BRONTE ST SOUTH
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Canada
Phone: 905-693-6733
Fax: 905-636-9388
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khalefih Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Khalefih ( CPSO# 85228 )

Business Address:
Unit 112
330 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone Number: (905) 636-9387

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAREK AHMAD KHALEFIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALEFIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2010