Khalili, Ida (CPSO#: 91751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Khalili-Boroujeni, Ida (used until: 06 Dec 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oxford Medical Imaging
Unit 716
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (647) 995-0152
Fax: (416) 260-2274
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Ave.
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 6558
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ida Khalili Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Khalili ( CPSO# 91751 )

Business Address:
716 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 260-9382

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IDA KHALILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALILI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009