Khamisa, Karima (CPSO#: 77631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone: (613) 224-6606
Fax: (613) 224-6162
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khamisa & Rose Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rose ( CPSO# 76187 )
Dr. K. Khamisa ( CPSO# 77631 )

Business Address:
Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3A3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 614-7671

Business Address:
60 Cambridge Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5

Business Address:
CPC 204
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 255-0274

Business Address:
College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 224-6606

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIMA KHAMISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAMISA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 24 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2005 to 24 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2006 to 24 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2007 to 05 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007