Khan, Asmat Ullah (CPSO#: 83408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:Nishtar Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building N-111, Rm 139
2 Field Ambulance,
Petawawa, Canadian Forces Base(CFB)
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone: 613-687-5511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asmat Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan ( CPSO# 83408 )

Business Address:
Building N-111
Room 139
2 Field Ambulance
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone Number: (613) 687-5511

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 27 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASMAT ULLAH KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 27 Nov 2007 to 26 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 27 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2014 to 27 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2015