Khan, Fareeha Sadiq (CPSO#: 94192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit B3
8015 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0B4
Phone: 905 456 9005
Fax: 905 456 9006
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 94192 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89612 )

Business Address:
Unit B3
8015 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0B4
Phone Number: (905) 456-9005

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
ER Department
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4618


Corporation Name: Fareeha Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 94192 )

Business Address:
B3 - 8015 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0B4
Phone Number: (905) 456-9005

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Feb 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAREEHA SADIQ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010