Khan, Muhammad Ali (CPSO#: 89612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Department of Emergency Medicine
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4605
Fax: 905-338-4149
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit B3
8015 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0B4
Canada
Phone: 902-456-9005
Fax: 905-456-9006
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 89612 )
Dr. F. Khan ( CPSO# 94192 )

Business Address:
Unit B3
8015 Financial Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 0B4
Phone Number: (905) 456-9005

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
ER Department
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4618

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ALI KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2008