Khatchadourian, Karine (CPSO#: 90281)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Div of Endocrinology and Metabolism
401 Smyth Road
Room 5004, 5th Floor West
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3939
Fax: (613) 738-4215
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karine Khatchadourian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Khatchadourian ( CPSO# 90281 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Endorcrinology and Metabolism
5th Floor West-Room 5004
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARINE KHATCHADOURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATCHADOURIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2013