Khulbe, Suman (CPSO#: 75449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: Khulbe, Suman Skye (used until: 19 Dec 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Karma Wellness
5 Windgate Crescent
K2M-2X8
Kanata ON  K2M 2X8
Phone: (613) 614-3825
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suman Khulbe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khulbe ( CPSO# 75449 )

Business Address:
Kanata Professional Centre
201 - 99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-1448

Business Address:
5 Windgate Crescent
Kanata ON  K2M 2X8
Phone Number: (613) 270-9879

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMAN KHULBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHULBE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 16 May 2001 to 03 Jun 2001
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2001