Khurshid, Faiza (CPSO#: 89657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Watkins 3
Room 4 3 218
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3729
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Faiza Khurshid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Khurshid ( CPSO# 89657 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 583-6232

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Pakistan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Sep 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 09 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2019 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Faiza Khurshid may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Pediatrics,   Division   of  Neonatal-Perinatal  Medicine,  Queen's
                        University, in which Dr. Khurshid  holds an academic appointment at
                        the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration will expire  on  the  earlier  of  the
                  following times:

                  (i)   on June 30, 2022,
                  
                  (ii)  when Dr. Khurshid  no  longer holds the academic appointment at the
                        rank  of  Assistant Professor  in  the  Department  of  Pediatrics,
                        Division of Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine at Queen's University, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee   makes   a   decision  about  Dr.  Khurshid's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report  indicating  that  Dr. Khurshid's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on September 4,  2013.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs  2  and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2022.