Kilty, Shaun Jason (CPSO#: 77665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
737 Parkdale Ave.
Rm. 259
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 18514
Fax: (613) 729-2412
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2935 Conroy Rd Unit 110
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 18514
Fax: (613) 729-2412
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kilty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kilty ( CPSO# 77665 )

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology
259 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 729-2312

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1

Business Address:
110 - 2935 Conroy Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 6C6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAUN JASON KILTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007