Kim, Christina Kyuhyun (CPSO#: 94064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Blvd West
Suite 205
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 508-5911 Ext. 403
Fax: (905) 508-2972
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 50554
Fax: (905) 494-6481
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christina Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kim ( CPSO# 94064 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-8011

Business Address:
Suite 101, Building 1
9401 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H7
Phone Number: (905) 883-2133

Business Address:
205 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 508-5911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Feb 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA KYUHYUN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010