Kim, Dennis S (CPSO#: 94207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2698 Jane Street 2nd Floor
North York ON  M3L 1C6
Phone: 416-743-2041
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D.S. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim ( CPSO# 94207 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
2698 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3L 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 743-2041

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS S KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2010 to 28 Jul 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2011 to 23 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2015