Kim, Dong Hwan (CPSO#: 83716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Kyungpook National University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Haematology & Oncology
OPG Room 6-222
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-6541
Fax: (416) 946-4563
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dong Hwan Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim ( CPSO# 83716 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 6-222
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 03 Mar 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 03 Mar 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 17 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Dong Hwan Kim may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Haematology/Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in
                        which  Dr.  Kim  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Kim  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.