Kini, Vishwas Manjunath (CPSO#: 94686)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 115
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone: (905) 794-9685
Fax: (905) 794-2826
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vishwas M Kini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kini ( CPSO# 94686 )

Business Address:
Unit 115
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Phone Number: (905) 794-9685

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VISHWAS MANJUNATH KINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Dec 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2011