Kitamura, Christopher (CPSO#: 95949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor, Posluns Building
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. x2068
Fax: (416) 785-2492
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Temskaming Hospital
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (705) 647-8121
Fax: (416) 352-1653
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

1849 Yonge Street, Suite 500
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Canada
Fax: (416) 352-1653
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. East, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: (416) 591-4417
Fax: (416) 352-1653
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KITAMURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KITAMURA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016