Knapp, Thomas Richard (CPSO#: 62531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville, Ontario
L6M 0L8
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 5614
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Dr.
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: 905 845 2571 Ext. 5614
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte St. S
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 5614
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2007


Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas Knapp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Knapp ( CPSO# 62531 )

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
30 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS RICHARD KNAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNAPP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1991