Knarr, Nadia Kristine (CPSO#: 79496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3A6
Phone: (613) 968-9840
Fax: (613) 968-5495
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

145 Station Street
Belleville Ontario
K8N2S9
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Canada
Phone: 613 771 3404
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Knarr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Knarr ( CPSO# 79496 )

Business Address:
240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3A6
Phone Number: (613) 968-9840

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA KRISTINE KNARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNARR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005