Kogon, Michael Daniel (CPSO#: 79431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2630 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H2
Phone: (905) 832-8428
Fax: (905) 832-6651
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Kogon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kogon ( CPSO# 79431 )

Business Address:
201 - 2630 Rutherford Road
Maple ON  L4K 0H2
Phone Number: (905) 832-8428

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 832-2310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DANIEL KOGON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOGON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2009