Kolb, Elena (CPSO#: 81932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: Ayoub, Elena (used until: 24 Oct 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Minsk State Medical Institute, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 474-0060
Fax: (705) 474-0069
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kolb ( CPSO# 81932 )

Business Address:
204 - 1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone Number: (705) 474-0060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA KOLB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006