Kolenchenko, Oxana (CPSO#: 95707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6A
145 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 1R5
Phone: (905) 685-4866
Fax: (905) 685-8162
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oxana Kolenchenko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Kolenchenko ( CPSO# 95707 )

Business Address:
Unit 6A
145 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 1R5
Phone Number: (905) 685-4866

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OXANA KOLENCHENKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLENCHENKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013