Kong, Grace Joanne (CPSO#: 89603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of London, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: (905) 683-6387
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Fax: (905) 883-2008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Grace Kong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kong ( CPSO# 89603 )

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
700 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5S9
Phone Number: (905) 430-4055

Business Address:
181 Bay street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (905) 648-4347

Business Address:
300 - 1131A Leslie Street
North York ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 360-7360

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE JOANNE KONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 15 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 06 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008