Koochesfahani, Kasra Mohseni (CPSO#: 96630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UBC Hospital, Koerner Pavilion
M334 - 2211 Wesbrook Mall
Vancouver BC  V6T 1Z3
Phone: 604 822 7689
Fax: 604 484 2209
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kasra Koochesfahani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 26 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: University of Toronto Koffler Student Services Centre Main Floor 111-214 College Street Toronto ON M5T 2Z9
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASRA MOHSENI KOOCHESFAHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOOCHESFAHANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011