Kouwenberg, Jennifer Lara (CPSO#: 89551)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.L. Kouwenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: QHC Regional Pediatrics Services Consulting Group Suite 305 274 Dundas St E Belleville ON K8N 1E6
Date Received: 26 Jul 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 27 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2017