Kozanczyn, Christa Rachael (CPSO#: 93344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore Family Medicine
Suite 216
11 Victoria Street
Barrie ON  L4N 6T3
Phone: (705) 503-4111
Fax: (705) 503-5111
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kozanczyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kozanczyn ( CPSO# 93344 )

Business Address:
11 Victoria Street
Suite 216
Barrie ON  L4N 6T3
Phone Number: (705) 503-4111

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 6T3
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Apr 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTA RACHAEL KOZANCZYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOZANCZYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013