Kraft, Sari Alana (CPSO#: 95924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Sports Medicine Specialists
150 Eglinton Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Phone: (416) 481-1601
Fax: (416) 481-1267
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

181 Bay Street, Suite 3000
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: 416-507-6600
Fax: 416-507-6750
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2489 Bloor Street West, Suite 102
Toronto ON  M6S 1R6
Canada
Phone: 416-780-8280
Fax: 416-760-0343
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen P. Kraft Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kraft ( CPSO# 31189 )
Dr. S. Kraft ( CPSO# 95924 )

Business Address:
Port Arthur Clinic
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Eye Clinic - 6th Floor Eye Clinic
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6123

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Eye Clinic Main Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7190

Business Address:
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehab
2nd Floor
150 Kilgour Road
Toronto ON  M4G 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 424-3823

Business Address:
Health First Medical Centre
208 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Richmond Hill ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-7711

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7E 1G5
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARI ALANA KRAFT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAFT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013