Krete, Derek Michael (CPSO#: 91821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Hospital
1 Hospital Drive
Outpatient Rehabilitation
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Fax: (705) 740-8187
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Krete Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Krete ( CPSO# 91821 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Outpatient Rehabilitation
Suite W2
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 740-8351

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Utah

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK MICHAEL KRETE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRETE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009