Krol-Szpakowski, Margaret (CPSO#: 61309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
255 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1J5
Phone: (905) 523-7944
Fax: (905) 523-1597
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret Krol-Szpakowski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Krol-Szpakowski ( CPSO# 61309 )

Business Address:
255 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 523-7944

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET KROL-SZPAKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KROL-SZPAKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990