Kruba, Richard Michael (CPSO#: 94590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52201
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5111 Ext. 77801
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Kruba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kruba ( CPSO# 94590 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Nov 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Richard   Michael   Kruba   may   practise   medicine   independently  in
            Anaesthesiology, only.