Kukaswadia, Sadiya Siddiq (CPSO#: 82616)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21300
Fax: 416-242-1073
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2221 Keele Street
Suite 315
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 647-344-7500
Fax: 647-344-7600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SADIYA SIDDIQ KUKASWADIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUKASWADIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010